IL SB0863 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, for State Board of Education appointments made after the effective date of the amendatory Act, 3 of the members of the State Board must represent the educator community. Sets forth the qualifications for these members and makes other changes with regard to the qualifications of members of the State Board.
Title
SCH CD-TRAINED OTHER STATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0584 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Effective Date April 6, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-01-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Education |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 7, 2017 |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-10-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-10-26 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-10-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 004-005-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-021-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-002-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1A-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |