IL SB0860 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Line of Duty Compensation Act. Changes the definition of "killed in the line of duty" to include losing one's life while on active duty in connection with, among other operations, Operation Freedom's Sentinel, Operation New Dawn, and Operation Inherent Resolve. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LINE OF DUTY COMPENSATION-DUTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0226
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203152Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback