IL SB0859 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, for the purpose of calculating the sales factor when allocating business income of persons other than residents, if the purchaser is the United States government, then the sale is a sale of personal property in this State if the purchaser is within the State or the property is shipped from an office, store, warehouse, factory or other place of storage in this State (currently, when the purchaser is the United States government, the sale is in this State only if the property is shipped from an office, store, warehouse, factory or other place of storage in this State). Removes provisions providing that the sale is in this State if the property is shipped from an office, store, warehouse, factory or other place of storage in this State and the purchaser is not taxable in the State of the purchaser. Removes provisions concerning purchasers who are doing business on a premises owned or leased by a person who has independently contracted with the seller for the printing of newspapers, periodicals or books. Removes provisions providing that sales of tangible personal property are not in this State if the seller and purchaser would be members of the same unitary business group but for the fact that either the seller or purchaser is a person with 80% or more of total business activity outside of the United States and the property is purchased for resale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-SALES FACTOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-02-22SenateTo Subcommittee on Income Taxes
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355304Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback