IL SB0858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Freedom to Work Act. Provides that "low-wage employee" means an employee whose earnings do not exceed the greater of (1) the hourly rate equal to the minimum wage required by the applicable federal, State, or local minimum wage law or (2) $13.00 per hour (instead of an employee who earns the greater of the applicable minimum wage or $13.00 per hour). Effective immediately.
Title
FREEDOM TO WORK-LOW WAGE
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0225 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 016-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 90 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |