IL SB0858 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Records Act. Provides that a unit of local government or a school district located in a county with a population of 100,000 or more shall have a website containing the following information for the current calendar year: (1) annual budget; (2) ordinances under which the unit of local government or school district operates; (3) financial reports and audits; (4) information concerning employee compensation; (5) taxes and fees imposed by the unit of local government or school district; (6) a debt disclosure report; and (7) a pension liability debt disclosure report. Provides that any citizen who is a resident of the unit of local government or school district may bring a mandamus or injunction action to compel the unit of local government or school district to comply with the Internet posting requirements. Provides a posting in perpetuity clause. Limits home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Contains a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVT-POST RECORDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2015-03-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2015-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2015-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2015-02-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-02-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2015-02-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-11SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.39New CodeSee Bill Text
5020525New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback