IL SB0854 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Racial Classification Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-003-000 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023 |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |