IL SB0851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that a library board of trustees' statement of financial requirements necessary for the next year and any amount the library board believes will be necessary to levy taxes for the library's next fiscal year shall be submitted to the governing board of the municipality no less than 60 days prior to when the tax levy must be certified under the Property Tax Code (rather than 60 days after the expiration of the fiscal year). Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARIES-FINANCIAL REPORTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 32 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - November 8, 2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-032-001 |
2017-11-08 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-11-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-11-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000 |
2017-11-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-11-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-11-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-10-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-10-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-07-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-23 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 5 | 4-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |