IL SB0851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that a library board of trustees' statement of financial requirements necessary for the next year and any amount the library board believes will be necessary to levy taxes for the library's next fiscal year shall be submitted to the governing board of the municipality no less than 60 days prior to when the tax levy must be certified under the Property Tax Code (rather than 60 days after the expiration of the fiscal year). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIBRARIES-FINANCIAL REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 32 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - November 8, 2017
2017-11-08SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-11-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-032-001
2017-11-08House3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-11-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-11-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-11-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000
2017-11-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-11-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-11-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-07-06HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-23HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7554-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback