IL SB0850 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cigarette Tax Act. Requires the Department of Revenue to issue a request for proposal to acquire and use digital tax stamps. Provides that, upon implementation of the digital stamps, a stamp is considered affixed if 90% or more of the stamp is affixed to the individual package. Contains provisions concerning reimbursement of licensed distributors for costs associated with the initial purchase of a tax stamping machine, and provides a tax collection discount for licensed distributors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIGARETTE TX-DIGITAL STAMPS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-14SenateFiscal Note Requested by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-22SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351303-3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback