IL SB0838 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act from January 1, 2016 to January 1, 2026. Amends the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning: definitions, application procedures, inactive licenses, qualifying parties, fees, grounds for discipline, disciplinary procedures, surrender of licenses, suspension of licenses, the Roofing Advisory Board, and home rule. Authorizes the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to compel physical or mental evaluations of licensees when necessary to ensure compliance with the Act. Adds provisions concerning confidentiality of investigative information and the issuance of citations. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ROOFING ACT-SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0469 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2015 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-23 | House | House Recedes 101-000-000 |
2015-06-23 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-06-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Recede Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-06-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-06-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Recede Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-06-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2015-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Non-Concurs |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Non-Concurs |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2015-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-05-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-001 |
2015-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-001 |
2015-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-04-27 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |