IL SB0837 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public University Administrative Cost Decrease Act. Provides that all public universities shall annually submit a cost certification that certifies the level of spending dedicated to administrative costs for the current academic year. Provides that beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, the Board of Trustees of a public university may not enact a budget that contains tuition or fee increases above that of the tuition and fees set in the 2016-2017 academic year until the Auditor General has verified that the cost certification submitted by the public university and due in the same calendar year of the proposed tuition or fees increase has shown a decrease of administrative costs by 25%. Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UNIVERSITIES-ADMIN COSTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Higher Education Administrative Costs, Tuition and Fees |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 3-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=837&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0837.htm |