IL SB0836 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that if the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency operates a motor vehicle inspection station or contracts with one or more parties to operate an inspection station on its behalf, the Agency shall locate the station so that the owners of vehicles subject to inspection reside within 5 (rather than 12) miles of an official inspection station.
Title
VEH CD-VEH INSPECTION STATION
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 13C-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=836&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0836.htm |