IL SB0836 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community Mental Health Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-15 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2009-04-23 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009
2009-04-23 Second Reading
2009-04-03 Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
2009-03-12 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
2009-03-12 Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
2009-03-05 Assigned to Executive
2009-02-06 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-06 First Reading
2009-02-06 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback