IL SB0834 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Election Integrity Act. Amends the Election Code. Requires that each election authority (i) conduct an election day audit of a random sample of 10% of votes cast and (ii) provide by contract or employment for the performance by one or more independent auditors of post-election parallel tabulations and audits. Provides for the scope of the audits and the resulting reports. Requires that optical scan technology and direct recording electronic voting systems meet certain federal and independent testing standards. Creates a voluntary tax checkoff for the Fund. With respect to early voting, requires that an election authority using only direct recording electronic voting systems have paper ballots available for voters wishing to use them. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Election Integrity Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-EQUIPMENT/AUDITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2018-04-11SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2017-08-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10517A-10New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-100New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-15New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-20New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-25New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-30New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-35New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-40New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-45New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-5New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-50New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-55New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-60New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-65New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-70New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-75New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-80New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-85New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-90New CodeSee Bill Text
10517A-95New CodeSee Bill Text
10519A-75Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-16Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-16Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-9Amended CodeCitation Text
105Art. 17A headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback