IL SB0826 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Repeals the Corporate Powers Exercised By County Board Article. Effective immediately.
Title
TOWNSHIP CD-COUNTY BOARD
Sponsors
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-006-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Re-assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-017-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; D. Turner |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-006-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 7-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |