IL SB0822 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall immediately revoke the license, permit, or driving privileges of any driver who commits aggravated overtaking or passing of a school bus. Creates the offense of aggravated overtaking or passing of a school bus. Adds to the definition of "medical examiner's certificate" an electronic submission of results of an examination conducted by a medical examiner listed on the National Registry of Certified Medical Examiners to the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration of a driver to medically qualify him or her to drive. Provides that beginning June 22, 2018, the Secretary shall post to a Commercial Driver License Information System driver record within one business day of electronic receipt from the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration certain information about a driver who has certified himself or herself as non-excepted interstate. Provides that the Secretary may waive a general knowledge test waiver for an applicant of a commercial learner's permit if the applicant: (1) is a current resident of this State; (2) is a current or former member of the military services; (3) within one year prior to the application, has been regularly employed in a military position that requires the operation of large trucks; (4) has received formal military training in the operation of a vehicle similar to the commercial motor vehicle the applicant expects to operate; and (5) provides the Secretary with a general knowledge test waiver form certifying that the applicant qualifies for the general knowledge test waiver. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-MISCELLANEOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0223 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harris |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-507.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-508.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |