IL SB0820 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning Freedom Schools, changes a reference from Black students to historically disadvantaged students, including African American students and other students of color. Makes a change to the membership of the Inclusive American History Commission. In a provision concerning accelerated placement, provides that for a student entering grade 12, the next most rigorous level of advanced coursework in English language arts or mathematics shall be a dual credit course, an Advanced Placement course, or an International Baccalaureate course. Changes the membership of the Whole Child Task Force, including adding members. Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2022 (rather than July 1, 2022), children who receive early intervention services prior to their third birthday and are found eligible for an individualized education program and whose birthday falls between May 1 and August 31 may continue to receive early intervention services until the beginning of the school year following their third birthday.
Title
FREEDOM SCHOOLS/ADVANCED PLACE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0209 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-043-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-009-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 231 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |