IL SB0813 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to the evidence-based funding formula, provides that, in recognition of the impact of COVID-19, the definition of "Average Student Enrollment" or "ASE" shall be adjusted for calculations for fiscal years 2022 through 2024. Provides that for fiscal years 2022 through 2024, the enrollment used in the calculation of ASE representing the 2020- 2021 school year shall be the greater of the enrollment for the 2020-2021 school year or the 2019-2020 school year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AVERAGE STUDENT ENROLLMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0033
2021-06-25SenateEffective Date June 25, 2021
2021-06-25SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-039-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-18HouseFiscal Note Filed
2021-05-14HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-006-000
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-001-000
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-04-14SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2021-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback