IL SB0789 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that a county board of any county, any township, or any municipality may use motor fuel tax funds allotted to it for the operation costs of any public transportation service, for capital improvements designed to improve or enhance pedestrian, bicycle, or transit mobility, or for infrastructure used to support publicly or privately owned electric vehicles.
Title
HGHWY CD-MOTOR FUEL TAX
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-042-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-004-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 5-701.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 6-701.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 7-202.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 7-202.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |