IL SB0779 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code in relation to investment transparency. Defines terms. Provides that within 90 days after entering into a new agreement to invest in an alternative investment fund, a public retirement system must disclose certain specified provisions of the agreement. Provides that a public retirement system shall require its alternative investment fund external managers and general partners to make certain annual disclosures concerning certain fees and expenses, in regard to each alternative investment fund. Provides that supplying a public retirement system with a completed reporting template developed by the Institutional Limited Partners Association constitutes compliance with certain reporting requirements. Declares the disclosures to be public records and requires their publication on the public retirement system's website. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-INVESTMENT DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-11-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-11-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-004-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-11-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-10-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-10-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 065-051-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Personnel & Pensions Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-019-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-005-000 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-113.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.17a | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.17b | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |