IL SB0779 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code in relation to investment transparency. Defines terms. Provides that within 90 days after entering into a new agreement to invest in an alternative investment fund, a public retirement system must disclose certain specified provisions of the agreement. Provides that a public retirement system shall require its alternative investment fund external managers and general partners to make certain annual disclosures concerning certain fees and expenses, in regard to each alternative investment fund. Provides that supplying a public retirement system with a completed reporting template developed by the Institutional Limited Partners Association constitutes compliance with certain reporting requirements. Declares the disclosures to be public records and requires their publication on the public retirement system's website. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make a conforming change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-INVESTMENT DISCLOSURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 065-051-000
2017-05-30HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Personnel & Pensions Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-30HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-05-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 034-019-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-005-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-113.17New CodeSee Bill Text
4051-113.17aNew CodeSee Bill Text
4051-113.17bNew CodeSee Bill Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback