IL SB0776 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Predatory Lending Database Article of the Residential Real Property Disclosure Act. Changes the definition of "counseling" and "originator". Provides that each certificate of compliance with the Article or certificate of exemption must contain, at a minimum, one of the borrower's names on the mortgage loan and the property index number for the subject property. Makes changes concerning the information which must be collected and submitted by the broker or originator and by the title insurance company or closing agent. Effective immediately.
Title
PREDATORY LENDING DATABASE
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0509 |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Effective Date September 15, 2017 |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-07-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-07-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 047-000-000 |
2017-07-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-06-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - June 28, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-06-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-06-26 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 77 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 77 | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 77 | 76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |