IL SB0772 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act by extending the repeal date of the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987 from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987. Defines "email address of record" and "address of record". Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Makes changes in provisions concerning the Podiatric Medical Licensing Board, grounds for disciplinary action, appointment of a hearing officer, and certification of records. Provides provisions concerning confidentiality of information collected by the Department in the course of an examination or investigation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PODIATRY PRACTICE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0564
2017-12-13SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-12-13SenateGovernor Approved
2017-11-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-11-09SenateSent to the Governor
2017-11-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-11-09SenateSenate Concurs
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2017-11-09Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-11-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-11-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 9, 2017
2017-11-09SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-11-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-11-08House3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-11-07SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-11-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-11-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-11-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22510012Amended CodeCitation Text
22510014Amended CodeCitation Text
22510015Amended CodeCitation Text
22510019Amended CodeCitation Text
22510020Repealed CodeCitation Text
22510024Amended CodeCitation Text
22510026Amended CodeCitation Text
22510027Amended CodeCitation Text
2251003Amended CodeCitation Text
22510034Amended CodeCitation Text
22510036Amended CodeCitation Text
22510039Repealed CodeCitation Text
22510040Amended CodeCitation Text
22510042Amended CodeCitation Text
22510046New CodeSee Bill Text
2251005Amended CodeCitation Text
2251005.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2251007Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=772&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0564.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0772ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0772_04252017_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0772_11082017_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0772ham002_11092017_007001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0772ham001_11092017_007000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback