IL SB0768 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, exemptions, powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Social Work Examining and Disciplinary Board, applications for original license, change of address, qualifications for clinical social worker licenses and licensed social worker licenses, license restrictions and limitations, grounds for disciplinary action, investigations, notices and hearings, findings and recommendations, motions for rehearing, appointment of a hearing officer, restoration of a license, summary suspension of a license, and certification of records. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLINICAL SOCIAL WORK-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-18HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2017-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2252010Amended CodeCitation Text
2252014Amended CodeCitation Text
2252019Amended CodeCitation Text
2252021Amended CodeCitation Text
2252022Amended CodeCitation Text
2252025Amended CodeCitation Text
2252026Amended CodeCitation Text
2252027Repealed CodeCitation Text
2252028Amended CodeCitation Text
225203Amended CodeCitation Text
2252030Amended CodeCitation Text
2252031Amended CodeCitation Text
2252032Amended CodeCitation Text
2252033Amended CodeCitation Text
2252034Amended CodeCitation Text
2252036Amended CodeCitation Text
2252037Amended CodeCitation Text
225204Amended CodeCitation Text
225205Amended CodeCitation Text
225206Amended CodeCitation Text
225207Amended CodeCitation Text
225207.3Amended CodeCitation Text
225209Amended CodeCitation Text
225209AAmended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback