IL SB0766 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Heroes Way Designation Program Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2019-04-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-03SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6051271Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback