IL SB0760 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that "ex parte communication" also includes situations when legislators impart or request material information or make a material argument regarding State university admissions or hiring or other personnel decisions at State agencies or universities. Modifies the term "interested party" to include a person or entity whose rights, privileges, or interests regard matters of university admissions or hiring or other personnel decisions at State agencies or universities. Adds the Illinois Board of Higher Education to the list of agencies required to report ex parte communications.
Title
GA EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=760&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0760.htm |