IL SB0760 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning terms.
Title
CAREER/WORKFORCE TRANSITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0468 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 102-007-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 009-007-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |