IL SB0759 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes a class 1 brewer, class 2 brewer, or a craft distiller to obtain a special use permit license. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SPECIAL USE PERMIT
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 014-001-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 1-3.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |