IL SB0758 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Forcible Entry and Detainer Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if the landlord, or his or her agent or attorney, is unable to personally serve the demand on the tenant, then constructive service of the demand may be accomplished. Makes corresponding changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EVICTIONS-CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2018-02-27SenateTo Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateRe-assigned to Judiciary
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2017-03-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73559-107Amended CodeCitation Text
73559-211Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback