IL SB0752 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall, by rule, prescribe retention periods of no longer than 2 years for indicated reports involving inadequate food, inadequate shelter, inadequate supervision, inadequate clothing, environmental neglect, lockout, and other categories as may be determined by the Department. Provides that nothing in this provision shall prohibit the Department from retaining an indicated report for up to 5 years in the foregoing categories of reports when there exist aggravated circumstances, as defined by rule. In a provision concerning appeals, provides that the Department shall, by rule, establish conditions under which an indicated report that has been properly appealed may be expunged upon completion of a course of services prescribed by the Department. Provides that notwithstanding the expiration of the deadline for appealing an indicated report and notwithstanding the previous issuance of a final administrative decision, the Director of the Department or his or her designee shall expunge from the central register either an indicated report or the name of a specified perpetrator if a court of law has found that either the alleged abuse or neglect, or the responsibility of the individual, was not established either by probable cause or by a preponderance of the evidence, provided that such court finding arises from the same nucleus of operative facts as the indicated report. Requires the Department to establish, by rule, a process for requesting relief on the basis of such court findings. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-CHILD ABUSE RPTS-EXPUNGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Back To Human Services; 003-002-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services; Human Services Subcommittee on Issues Relating to the Department of Children and Family Services |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services; Human Services Subcommittee on Issues Relating to the Department of Children and Family Services |
2015-02-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Issues Relating to Department of Children and Family Services |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |