IL SB0748 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Changes the number of additional members of the State Banking Board of Illinois from 11 to 12. Provides that one member of the Board shall be from a savings bank, and there shall also be an alternate member from a savings bank to attend meetings if and only if the sitting member from a savings bank is unable to attend the meeting. Changes the requirements for the 2 public members. Amends the Savings Bank Act. Repeals provisions relating to the Board of Savings Banks. Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Removes provisions relating to the Residential Mortgage Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BANKING-BOARDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-17SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
2018-02-14SenateRe-assigned to Financial Institutions
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-22SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20520512104Repealed CodeCitation Text
205205Art. 12.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
205578Amended CodeCitation Text
205579Amended CodeCitation Text
2056351-4Amended CodeCitation Text
2056351-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
2056354-1Amended CodeCitation Text
2056354-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback