IL SB0748 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0783
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Changes the number of additional members of the State Banking Board of Illinois from 11 to 12. Provides that one member of the Board shall be from a savings bank, and there shall also be an alternate member from a savings bank to attend meetings if and only if the sitting member from a savings bank is unable to attend the meeting. Changes the requirements for the 2 public members. Amends the Savings Bank Act. Repeals provisions relating to the Board of Savings Banks. Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Removes provisions relating to the Residential Mortgage Board. Effective immediately.
Title
BANKING-BOARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0783 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 205 | 12104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | Art. 12.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 5 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 5 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 635 | 1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 635 | 1-5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 635 | 4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 635 | 4-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |