IL SB0731 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administrative Review Law of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that: the term "parties of record" does not include individuals who are not acting in an official capacity and whose participation in proceedings before an administrative agency is limited to attendance or testimony at a public hearing or submission of written statements to the agency; the plaintiff shall send a notice of filing of the action by certified mail to each individual who is not a party of record and who submitted testimony or a written statement to the administrative agency with respect to the decision from which the action to review is taken; and an individual who submitted testimony or a written statement to the administrative agency with respect to the decision from which the action to review is taken has a right to intervene as a defendant in the action upon application made to the court within 30 days of the mailing of the notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-ZONING BD OF APPEALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-10HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 012-000-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73553-107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback