IL SB0726 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONNEL-INTERNS-DISABILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0533
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2019
2019-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-000-000
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2019-04-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15151Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=726&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0726.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0726eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0726enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0533.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0726sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0726ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0726ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0726_04112019_064000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0726_05262019_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0726ham002_05312019_029001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0726ham001_05312019_029000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback