IL SB0725 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Operating Standards Act. Repeals language repealing the Act on January 21, 2021.
Title
OPEN OPERATING STANDARDS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0314 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Ellman |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |