IL SB0723 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LIQUOR-LICENSE-100 FEET-CHURCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0274 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-002-000 |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |