IL SB0707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personal Information Protection Act. Provides that a State agency that has been subject to a single breach or aggravated computer tampering to the security of its data shall submit a comprehensive report to the Attorney General and the General Assembly. Specifies the content of the report. Requires the report to be made available to the public. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONAL INFO PRTCT AGENCY RPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0412
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
2017-05-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
81553012Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=707&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0707.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0707eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0707enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0412.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0707sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0707sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0707ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0707_05112017_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0707_05302017_065000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0707_05312017_087000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback