IL SB0704 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education is, subject to appropriation, authorized to award competitive grants under a Safe Schools and Healthy Learning Environments Program. Provides that under the program, selected school districts must reallocate funding for school-based law enforcement personnel in some or all of their schools to other evidence-based and promising practices designed to promote school safety and healthy learning environments, including, but not limited to, restorative justice programs; increased use of school psychologists, social workers, and other mental and behavioral health specialists; drug and alcohol treatment services; wraparound services for youth; and training for school staff on conflict resolution techniques and other disciplinary alternatives. Provides that the program shall match the amount that is reallocated from school-based law enforcement personnel to alternative methods of addressing student behavior on a dollar-for-dollar basis. Prohibits grant funds from being used to increase the use of school-based security personnel. Provides for an annual report to update progress on the Program. Prohibits arrest or being otherwise cited for a criminal offense committed during school hours while on school grounds, in school vehicles, or at school activities or sanctioned events except in certain circumstances.
Title
SCH CD-UNNECESSARY ARRESTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-003 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.170 | New Code | See Bill Text |