IL SB0701 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Expands the scope of the Act to include reports of abandonment. Requires the Department on Aging to offer, subject to appropriations, an annual trauma-informed training program that includes instruction on how trauma impacts caseworkers and other employees who respond to and prevent adult abuse, neglect, exploitation, or abandonment. Requires the Department to develop and implement a demonstration project to allow for the use of a risk assessment tool to assist in identifying elderly persons who may be experiencing elder abuse, abandonment, neglect, or exploitation. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for theft by deception of a victim age 60 or older or a person with a disability may be commenced within 7 years of the last act committed in furtherance of the crime. Concerning the offense of financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability, expands the scope of "person who stands in a position of trust and confidence" to include a friend or acquaintance of the elderly person or person with a disability who is in a position of trust.
Title
ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0244 |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Crowe |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Crowe |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 25 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |