IL SB0698 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that Illinois Identification Cards issued to persons upon conditional release or absolute discharge from the custody of the Department of Human Services be issued prior to release or discharge (instead of no sooner than 14 days prior to release or discharge). Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that applicants for school bus driver permits and commercial driver's licenses must not have been convicted of (i) aggravated domestic battery, or (ii) specified offenses under the Liquor Control Act of 1934 within the last 20 years before the date of the application (rather than at any point in the applicant's past). Provides that, regardless of whether an exemption for employment-related transportation applies, every person required to install and maintain an ignition interlock device shall not be eligible for reinstatement until the person installs an ignition interlock device and maintains the ignition interlock device for 5 years. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a subsection concerning required proof of financial responsibility does not apply to a person who, at the time of the offense, was operating a motor vehicle registered in a state other than Illinois. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOS: ID CARDS-CDL-SCHOOL BUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2021-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153354Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-106.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-206Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-508Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback