IL SB0695 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board Division of the Counties Code. Abolishes the current Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board. Creates the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board to exercise all functions of the former Merit Board. Provides for the functions and operation of the Cook County Sheriff's Merit Board, including appointment, composition, powers, responsibilities, and rulemaking. Provides that the Sheriff of Cook County is solely responsible for the adjudication of all disciplinary measures against a sworn officer when the recommended punishment for the violation alleged is the suspension of the sworn officer for a period not exceeding 30 days. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COOK CO SHERIFF MERIT BOARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0562
2017-12-08SenateGovernor Approved
2017-11-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-11-08SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-11-08SenateSenate Concurs
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Local Government
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 8, 2017
2017-11-08SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-11-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-11-07House3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-11-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000
2017-10-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-25HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-7000.5New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-7002Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-7003Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-7005Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-7007Repealed CodeCitation Text
5553-7008Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-7011Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-7012Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-7012.5New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-7018New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=695&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0562.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0695ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0695_05032017_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0695_11072017_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0695ham001_11082017_014000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback