IL SB0691 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Passenger Protection Act. Provides that a technician shall discuss with a person who received a citation for a violation of the Act with the notation of "no safety seat" in the notes field, and has scheduled a child safety instructional course, the negative consequences of a motor vehicle accident with a child occurring without the child wearing a proper child restraint system. The technician may also discuss the importance of an adult wearing a safety belt and the impact it may have on the child's behavior.
Title
AUTOMATED TRAFFIC/ST POLICE
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 013-003-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 25 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |