IL SB0687 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INCOME TAX RATES-CREDITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0008
2019-06-05SenateEffective Date January 1, 2021; does not take effect unless SJRCA 1 is approved by voters prior to that date.
2019-06-05SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-020-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019
2019-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-048-000
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-006-000
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-01HouseArrived in House
2019-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-022-000
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
2019-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-006-000
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35251Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=687&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0687.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0687eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0687enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0008.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0687sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0687sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0687ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0687_05012019_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0687_05302019_063000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0687ham001_05312019_074000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback