IL SB0685 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Domestic Violence Fatality Review Act. Defines terms. Establishes findings and purposes of the Act. Creates the Ad Hoc Statewide Domestic Violence Fatality Review Committee of the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority Board, and provides for: membership; terms and vacancies of members; quorum; meetings; compensation; duties; and responsibilities. Allows a regional domestic violence fatality review team to be established within the boundaries of each judicial circuit, and provides for: membership; terms of members; vacancies; quorum; meetings; compensation; duties; and responsibilities. Adds provisions governing: cases eligible for review; confidentiality of regional review teams, information, and domestic violence fatality reviews; access to records and information; storage and destruction of confidential information; penalties for unlawful disclosure of confidential information; and immunity. Makes conforming changes in the Open Meetings Act and the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FATAL REVIEW

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Public Safety; 007-000-000
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Public Safety
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51202Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=685&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0685.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0685eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0685enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0685ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0685ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0685_04232021_032025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0685_05272021_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0685ham002_05312021_018001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0685ham001_05312021_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback