IL SB0685 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a county board may establish a salary for a State's attorney higher than provided for in the Code. However, any salary above the amounts provided for in the Code shall be paid out of the county treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE'S ATTORNEY-SALARY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Connelly
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 009-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-001
2017-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5554-2001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback