IL SB0682 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In the Article concerning the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, makes changes to the organization of provisions concerning coverage and limitations and powers and duties of the Association. Makes changes in the provisions concerning definitions; the Board of Directors of the Association; assessments; and miscellaneous provisions. In a provision concerning duties of the Director of Insurance as liquidator, provides that upon the entry of an order directing liquidation of a company, the Director may, subject to a provision of the Insurance Code that allows the Association to exercise all the rights of the Director with respect to covered policies after the Association becomes obligated by statute or a provision of the Health Maintenance Organization Act, cede or reinsure all or so much as may be necessary of the in-force business to another company using assets of the liquidated company to pay therefor in preference to satisfying other obligations or creditors. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-LIFE AND HEALTH GUARANTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155193Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.03Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.05Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.07Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.08Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.09Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.10Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback