IL SB0681 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that if a defendant is accused of an offense of driving under the influence or aggravated driving under the influence as defined in the Illinois Vehicle Code, and if the defendant refused chemical testing requested by a law enforcement officer, evidence of the defendant's commission of another offense or offenses of driving under the influence or aggravated driving under the influence is admissible, and may be considered for its bearing on any matter to which it is relevant. Provides that in weighing the probative value of the evidence against undue prejudice to the defendant, the court may consider: the proximity in time to the charged or predicate offense; the degree of factual similarity to the charged or predicate offense; whether the predicate offense resulted in a finding of guilt; or other relevant facts and circumstances. Provides that if the prosecution intends to offer this evidence, it must disclose the evidence, including statements of witnesses or a summary of the substance of any testimony, at a reasonable time in advance of trial, or during trial if the court excuses pretrial notice on good cause shown. Provides that proof may be made by specific instances of conduct, testimony as to reputation, or testimony in the form of an expert opinion, except that the prosecution may offer reputation testimony only after the opposing party has offered that testimony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-DUI-EVIDENCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-14SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-01-30SenateRe-assigned to Criminal Law
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255115-7.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback