IL SB0680 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act. Provides that used, expired, or unwanted pharmaceuticals collected by a city, village, or municipality under the Act may be destroyed in a drug destruction device by a law enforcement agency. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Expands the definition of "drug evidence" in the provision for drug destruction by a law enforcement agency to include any used, expired, or unwanted pharmaceuticals collected under the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXPIRED UNUSED DRUG DISPOSAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff
2017-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-01-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21015017Amended CodeCitation Text
415522.58Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback