IL SB0678 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality may adjudicate speeding tickets of 15 miles per hour or less over the posted speed limit in its administrative adjudication system.
Title
MUNI CD-SPEEDING 15 MPH OVER
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=678&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0678.htm |