IL SB0677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Ratifies and approves the Nurse Licensure Compact, which allows for the issuance of multistate licenses that allow nurses to practice in their home state and other compact states. Provides that the Compact does not supersede existing State labor laws.
Title
NURSE LICENSURE COMPACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Remains in Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-007-000 |
2017-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-003 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 85-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 85-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | Art. 85 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |